|
06/15/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3791.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected June 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5202.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5069.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and ordered to Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4790.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2680.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2649.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Corrected January 6.)
|
|
|
|
12/21/2011
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|