01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/18/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/04/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |