08/16/2012 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/08/2012 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/05/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/02/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1120.) (May 26). | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
04/11/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 452.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |