01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/23/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/11/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/03/2011 | Set for hearing May 9. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/02/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 13). | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. | |||
01/06/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. | |||
01/05/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |