01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
08/25/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/15/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/14/2011 | Set for hearing August 15. | |||
07/12/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/11/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1762.) (July 6). | |||
06/01/2011 | Set for hearing June 15. | |||
05/16/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/11/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |