|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1232.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1120.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 850.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|