|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 473, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2151.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 2585.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 653.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 543.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|