02/01/2012 | Died on the inactive file. | |||
06/01/2011 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Steinberg. | |||
05/03/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/02/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 765.) (April 26). | |||
04/15/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/11/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |