01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/12/2011 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 620.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/25/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/14/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/11/2011 | Set for hearing March 22. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |