|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 267, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4623.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5965.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 859.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|