|
06/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1120.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 859.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|