01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/05/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
12/08/2011 | Set for hearing January 9. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/12/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
03/31/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |