|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2586.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1172.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 736.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|