07/05/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/29/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/02/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/27/2011 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/09/2011 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Negrete McLeod. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 863.) (May 3). | |||
04/15/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing March 29. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |