01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/19/2012 | Set for hearing January 19. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
01/17/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
01/14/2012 | Set for hearing January 17. | |||
01/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2640.) . Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/06/2012 | Set for hearing January 10. | |||
01/05/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/04/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set for hearing April 4. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |