08/01/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2011. | |||
08/01/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/19/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |||
07/14/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 2330.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). | |||
05/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/03/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 805.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 544.) (April 5). | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |