|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1264.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1121.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 581.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|