LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB706
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB706
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB706
Compare Versions
SB706 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB706 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB706 Amended August 26, 2011
SB706 Amended August 15, 2011
SB706 Amended July 12, 2011
SB706 Amended June 27, 2011
SB706 Amended May 31, 2011
SB706 Amended April 25, 2011
SB706 Amended March 24, 2011
SB706 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB706 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB706 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB706 Amended August 26, 2011
SB706 Amended August 15, 2011
SB706 Amended July 12, 2011
SB706 Amended June 27, 2011
SB706 Amended May 31, 2011
SB706 Amended April 25, 2011
SB706 Amended March 24, 2011
SB706 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare