|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 343, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2162.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 8. Page 2640.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 846.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|