08/30/2011 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. | |||
08/22/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/22/2011 | Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/18/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/18/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2455.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/14/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
07/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). | |||
06/22/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
05/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
05/05/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 878.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 808.) (April 27). | |||
03/29/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |