|
07/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 809.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|