|
09/13/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 6191.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2699.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2669.) (January 17).
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2638.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|