|
02/28/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1911.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2344.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1186.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 856.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 767.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|