01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/11/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 5. Page 2641.) | |||
12/21/2011 | Set for hearing January 11. | |||
04/25/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
03/30/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |