05/05/2011 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/04/2011 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 847.) | |||
05/03/2011 | Set for hearing May 5 in JUD. pending receipt. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |