03/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/14/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 165.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/10/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |