07/01/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/29/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/22/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |||
06/20/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/20/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1998.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |||
04/28/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/31/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 499.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/29/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
03/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 22). | |||
03/11/2011 | Set for hearing March 22. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |