08/01/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2011. | |||
08/01/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/19/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |||
07/14/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2345.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/07/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
07/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/18/2011 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/11/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 930.) (May 10). | |||
04/11/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |