07/06/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/03/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 807.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/27/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 739.) (April 26). | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |