|
02/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1999.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 2253.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 949.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|