01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/09/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/06/2012 | Set for hearing January 10. | |||
01/05/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
03/09/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |