|
06/25/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2699.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2669.) (January 17).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2641.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|