|
09/25/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 6580.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 6580.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Motion to reconsider continued to August 29.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 25. Page 5528.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Fuentes.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (June 18).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1060.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 951.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|