|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1909.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2251.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2229.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1060.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected May 23.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 886.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|