01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/05/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/23/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/11/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 851.) (May 4). | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |