|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 722, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2273.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2790.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1014.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 861.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 786.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|