California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB759 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/06/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 759ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 25, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 22, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lieu FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 1353.8 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 759, Lieu. Common interest developments: artificial turf. Existing law requires a local agency to adopt a specified model ordinance regarding water-efficient landscapes or a water-efficient landscape ordinance that is at least as effective in conserving water as the model ordinance. Existing law allows certain water providers to take specified actions regarding water conservation. The Davis-Stirling Common Interest Development Act provides for the creation and regulation of common interest developments. That act provides that a provision of any of the governing documents of a common interest development is void and unenforceable if it prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of low water-using plants as a group, or if it has the effect of prohibiting or restricting compliance with a local water-efficient landscape ordinance or water conservation measure, as described above. This bill would provide that a provision of any of the governing documents of a common interest development shall be void and unenforceable if it prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of artificial turf or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass. This prohibition would not prohibit an association from applying landscape rules and regulations established in governing documents that establish design standards and quality standards for the installation of artificial turf, or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass, to the extent the rules and regulations do not prohibit the use of artificial turf or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1353.8 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 1353.8. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a provision of any of the governing documents of a common interest development shall be void and unenforceable if it does any of the following: (1) Prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of low water-using plants as a group. (2) Prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of artificial turf or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass. (3) Has the effect of prohibiting or restricting compliance with either of the following: (A) A water-efficient landscape ordinance adopted or in effect pursuant to subdivision (c) of Section 65595 of the Government Code. (B) Any regulation or restriction on the use of water adopted pursuant to Section 353 or 375 of the Water Code. (b) (1) This section shall not prohibit an association from applying landscaping rules and regulations established in the governing documents, to the extent the rules and regulations fully conform with the requirements of subdivision (a). (2) This section shall not prohibit an association from applying landscape rules and regulations established in governing documents that establish design standards and quality standards for the installation of artificial turf, or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass, to the extent the rules and regulations conform with the requirement of paragraph (2) of subdivision (a).