|
06/15/2012
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1233.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1122.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 766.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|