|
06/28/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2715.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2642.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 863.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|