01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/04/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
12/15/2011 | Set for hearing January 10. | |||
03/29/2011 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |||
03/17/2011 | Set for hearing March 29. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |