|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2686.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 558.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|