LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB79
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB79
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB79
Compare Versions
SB79 Chaptered August 1, 2011
SB79 Enrolled July 15, 2011
SB79 Amended July 11, 2011
SB79 Amended March 23, 2011
SB79 Amended March 17, 2011
SB79 Amended March 14, 2011
SB79 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB79 Chaptered August 1, 2011
SB79 Enrolled July 15, 2011
SB79 Amended July 11, 2011
SB79 Amended March 23, 2011
SB79 Amended March 17, 2011
SB79 Amended March 14, 2011
SB79 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare