|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 599, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2451.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 3045.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1122.) (May 26). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 858.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|