08/25/2011 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 2570.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 865.) (May 3). | |||
04/14/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/31/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |