|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2596.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 706.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 416.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|