|
01/04/2012
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2446.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 8991.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 742.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|