06/06/2011 | Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file. | |||
03/24/2011 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending. | |||
03/24/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2011. | |||
03/24/2011 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |||
03/22/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 8:50 p.m. | |||
03/16/2011 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 355.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
03/16/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 582.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/14/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 167.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
02/10/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |