LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB81
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB81
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB81
Compare Versions
SB81 Chaptered February 10, 2012
SB81 Enrolled February 2, 2012
SB81 Amended January 30, 2012
SB81 Amended January 19, 2012
SB81 Amended March 14, 2011
SB81 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB81 Chaptered February 10, 2012
SB81 Enrolled February 2, 2012
SB81 Amended January 30, 2012
SB81 Amended January 19, 2012
SB81 Amended March 14, 2011
SB81 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare