02/01/2012 | Died on third reading. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 15. Page 2724.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2724.) | |||
01/23/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/19/2012 | Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2686.) (January 19). | |||
01/17/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
01/12/2012 | Set for hearing January 17. | |||
05/23/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/19/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/11/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/10/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 886.) (May 4). | |||
04/26/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
03/31/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |