01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/09/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 9. | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 737.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
03/29/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |